VA HB562 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial entity offering social media accounts; restricted hours for minors; civil liability. Provides that no commercial entity that offers social media accounts, as defined in the bill, shall knowingly or intentionally allow a minor to access his social media account during the hours of 12:00 a.m. to 6:00 a.m. unless the minor's parent, guardian, or legal custodian has provided permission for the minor to use such social media account during these hours. The bill provides that any commercial entity that violates these provisions shall be subject to civil liability for damages resulting from the interference with a minor's sleep cycle or mental health by allowing such minor to access to his social media account during the hours of 12:00 a.m. to 6:00 a.m. and reasonable attorney fees and costs.
Title
Commercial entity offering social media accounts; restricted hours for minors, civil liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104695D |
Same As/Similar To
SB532 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)