VA HB575 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Persons employed to perform forensic science duties; training and certification; policies for reporting wrongdoing or misconduct. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to establish a comprehensive framework, in coordination with the Department of Forensic Science and with the approval of the Forensic Science Board, for the employment, job entry training, and certification requirements for any person employed by any state or local law-enforcement agency to perform forensic laboratory services or forensic science duties, including a forensic specialist or forensic analyst, which training and certification shall be administered by the Department of Forensic Science. The bill provides that the comprehensive framework shall include (i) developing policies and procedures for such employees to report instances of wrongdoing or misconduct committed by another such employee, a law-enforcement officer, or an attorney for the Commonwealth; (ii) establishing and publishing a model policy for the employment, job entry training, and certification for such employees; and (iii) establishing compulsory minimum training standards for basic training and recertification of such employees. Persons employed to perform forensic science duties; training and certification; policies for reporting wrongdoing or misconduct. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to establish a comprehensive framework, in coordination with the Department of Forensic Science and with the approval of the Forensic Science Board, for the employment, job entry training, and certification requirements for any person employed by any state or local law-enforcement agency to perform forensic laboratory services or forensic science duties, including a forensic specialist or forensic analyst, which training and certification shall be administered by the Department of Forensic Science. The bill provides that the comprehensive framework shall include (i) developing policies and procedures for such employees to report instances of wrongdoing or misconduct committed by another such employee, a law-enforcement officer, or an attorney for the Commonwealth; (ii) establishing and publishing a model policy for the employment, job entry training, and certification for such employees; and (iii) establishing compulsory minimum training standards for basic training and recertification of such employees. Additionally, the bill requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to appoint a policy and curriculum review committee to assist the Department in carrying out its duties in establishing the comprehensive framework and requires that such establishment shall require approval of the majority of the members of the policy and curriculum review committee and is subject to final approval of the Forensic Science Board. The bill requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to establish the comprehensive framework by January 1, 2025, and all law-enforcement agencies to adopt the policies and procedures by July 1, 2025. The bill also requires any person employed by any state or local law-enforcement agency to perform forensic laboratory services or forensic science duties, including a forensic specialist or forensic analyst prior to July 1, 2024, to complete the training required by the bill by January 1, 2026. The bill also requires the Forensic Science Board to develop policies and procedures for employees of the Department of Forensic Science to report instances of wrongdoing or misconduct committed by another employee of the Department of Forensic Science or an employee of an entity for which the Department of Forensic Science has the responsibility to perform forensic laboratory services.
Title
Persons employed to perform forensic science duties; training and certification, policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106141D-H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (14-Y 7-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104591D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 1 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 1110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 112.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |