VA HB590 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation. Removes obsolete language from various sections of Title 54.1 and repeals one obsolete section of Title 54.1. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Professional and Occupational Regulation, Department of; removes obsolete language from Title 54.1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091) | |
2010-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 91 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB590ER) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-28 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100317D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2344 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 404.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |