VA HB591 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land bank entities; real property tax exemption for certain leasehold interests. Exempts from real property taxation leasehold interests in property acquired or used by a land bank entity.
Title
Land bank entities; real property tax exemption for certain leasehold interests.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 437 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB591ER) |
2018-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred from Finance by voice vote |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100279D |