VA HB603 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB603
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Medical Assistance Services; reimbursement for services; family members. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to revise its regulations governing reimbursement for individuals receiving treatment under the state plan for medical assistance and any waivers thereto to allow reimbursement of family members, including spouses, who provide qualifying services.
Title
Medical Assistance Services, Board of; reimbursement for services, family members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101758D |
Same As/Similar To
HB603 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB603 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB603+hil |