VA HB619 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Military centered community zones; local designation. Allows localities to establish, by ordinance, one or more military centered community zones, defined in the bill as a community that has a significant presence of military personnel living or working in the designated area and where such presence drives, or has the potential to drive, significant economic activity. The bill provides that a locality, or another political subdivision acting on behalf of the locality, may offer unique benefits to businesses looking to locate within a zone for the purpose of serving the needs of the military personnel, including reduction of certain fees and taxes. In addition, the bill provides that local governing bodies are authorized to enter into agreements for the payment of economic development incentive grants to such businesses. The bill also allows a governing body to provide for certain regulatory flexibility and incentives and provides that the establishment of a military centered community zone shall not preclude the area from also being designated as an enterprise zone or from receiving support under the Virginia Military Community Infrastructure Grant Program.
Title
Military centered community zones; localities may establish, by ordinance, one or more zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 298 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB619ER) |
2024-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 24104738D-E |
2024-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB619E |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred from Finance by voice vote |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104738D |
Same As/Similar To
SB343 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0350)