VA HB63 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Additional local sales and use tax to support schools. Adds Prince Edward County to the list of localities that, under current law, are authorized to impose an additional local sales and use tax at a rate not to exceed one percent, with the revenue used only for capital projects for the construction or renovation of schools.
Title
Sales and use tax, local; additional tax in Prince Edward County to support construction of schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Finance |
2022-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102306D |