VA HB637 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Involuntary commitment; special justice and attorney fees. Increases the fee paid to special justices for hearings for involuntary commitment from $86.25 to $150 and for certification hearings and orders for judicial authorization of treatment from $43.25 to $75 and increases fees paid to attorneys appointed in involuntary commitment from $75 to $120 and for guardianship cases from $43.25 to $75.
Title
Involuntary commitment; increases special justice and attorney fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102330D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Professions and Occupations
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Professions and Occupations