VA HB655 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Summary
Dangerous dogs; judicial discretion. Provides a court with the authority not to declare a dog to be a dangerous dog for good cause, based on the evidence before it if the dog is not dangerous or a threat to the community. Currently, a court is required to declare a dog dangerous if there is any bite, attack, or injury to a person, even if the bite, attack, or injury is accidental or negligible.
Title
Dogs, dangerous; judicial discretion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360) | |
2008-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 360 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB655ER) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-21 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-21 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-17 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-16 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083235520 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB655 |