VA HB655 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; disclosure by local government officers and employees. Provides that an officer or employee of local government who has a personal interest in a transaction but who is still eligible to participate in the transaction because he is a member of a business, profession, occupation, or group of three or more persons the members of which are affected by the transaction need only declare his interest in the transaction at the first meeting at which the transaction is discussed and at least one subsequent meeting thereafter. Current law requires that such interest be disclosed at each meeting of the governmental or advisory agency at which the transaction is discussed.
Title
Conflict of Interests Act, State and Local Government; disclosure by local government officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103500D |