VA HB655 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - VOTE: Defeated (43-Y 55-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - VOTE: Defeated (43-Y 55-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Local fiscal distress; determination by Auditor of Public Local fiscal distress; determination by Auditor of Public Accounts; state intervention. Sets out a procedure for determining when localities are in fiscal distress, as defined in the bill, and when state intervention may be necessary. The bill requires the Auditor of Public Accounts to develop criteria for a preliminary determination that a locality may be in fiscal distress. The bill also requires the Director of the Department of Planning and Budget to identify any amounts remaining unexpended from general fund appropriations in the state budget as of June 30 of each year, which constitute state aid to local governments. From such unexpended balances, the Governor may reappropriate up to $750,000 from amounts that would otherwise revert to the balance of the general fund and transfer such amounts as necessary to establish a component of fund balance that may be used for the purpose of providing technical assistance and intervention actions for localities deemed to be fiscally distressed and in need of intervention to address such distress. The bill provides that if a report to the Governor concludes that a locality is either unwilling or unable to comply with the conditions necessary to address its fiscal distress, the Governor shall use all powers available to him to intervene for the purpose of addressing such fiscal distress. The bill further grants authority to the Governor to appoint an emergency fiscal manager and grant the manager with all powers available and necessary to implement a plan to restore sustainable fiscal health to the locality. The emergency fiscal officer shall give timely notice of any proposed actions to be taken and an opportunity for public input prior to such action and shall establish benchmarks that will allow a locality to exit the state intervention plan upon meeting such benchmarks.
Title
Local fiscal distress; determination by Auditor of Public Accounts, state intervention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Defeated (43-Y 55-N) (Y: 43 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Defeated (43-Y 55-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (43-Y 55-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB655H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107504D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107504D-H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104811D |
Same As/Similar To
SB645 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426)
Subjects
Auditor of Public Accounts
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Counties Cities and Towns
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Counties Cities and Towns
Study Commissions Committees and Reports