VA HB657 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (7-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (7-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Pedestrian control signals; applicability to persons riding bicycles and other devices. Allows persons riding a bicycle, electric personal assistive mobility device, electric power-assisted bicycle, moped, or motorized skateboard or scooter to, while remaining in the travel lane, follow the pedestrian control signal corresponding to the person's direction of travel, provided that they travel straight or turn right and yield to pedestrians lawfully in the crosswalk and any vehicle approaching the intersection from the right. Pedestrian control signals; applicability to persons riding bicycles and other devices. Allows persons riding a bicycle, electric personal assistive mobility device, electric power-assisted bicycle, moped, or motorized skateboard or scooter to, while remaining in the travel lane, follow the pedestrian control signal corresponding to the person's direction of travel, provided that they travel straight or turn right and yield to pedestrians lawfully in the crosswalk and any vehicle approaching the intersection from the right.
Title
Pedestrian control signals; applicability to persons riding bicycles and other devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (7-Y 7-N) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 42-N) (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 42-N) (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (7-Y 7-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-12 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 42-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House (56-Y 42-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB657H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106480D-H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106480D-H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 7-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Highway Safety and Policy |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103294D |