VA HB667 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Staff Sergeant Darrell "Shifty" Powers Memorial Highway. Designates Shifty Lane in the Town of Clinchco the "Staff Sergeant Darrell "Shifty" Powers Memorial Highway."
Title
Staff Sergeant Darrell "Shifty" Powers Memorial Highway; designates Shifty Lane in Town of Clinchco.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053) | |
2022-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 53 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB667ER) |
2022-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102647D |
Subjects
Clinchco Town of
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Staff Sergeant Darrell "Shifty" Powers Memorial Highway
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Staff Sergeant Darrell "Shifty" Powers Memorial Highway