VA HB684 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Condominium and Property Owners' Association Acts; rental of units and lots; disclosure packets. Prohibits a unit owners' association or property owners' association from charging an annual or monthly rental fee or any other fee not expressly authorized in the Condominium Act or Property Owners' Association Act, respectively. The bill also (i) provides that an association has no authority to evict a tenant; (ii) provides that if an owner designates a person licensed by the Real Estate Board as the owner's authorized representative with respect to any lease, the association shall recognize such representation without a formal power of attorney; and (iii) adds certain definitions regarding delivery and receipt of disclosure documents. The bill conforms the Property Owners' Association Act to the Condominium Act relating to provision of disclosure documents in electronic form and charges therefor. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Condominium and Property Owners' Association Acts; rental of units and lots; disclosure packets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 471 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB684ER) |
2016-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB684H1 |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104499D-H1 |
2016-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104499D-H1 |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103672D |