VA HB709 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile records; expungement; certain felony larceny offenses. Provides for the expungement of juvenile records for certain offenses that would be felony larceny if committed by an adult if the juvenile has not been adjudicated delinquent of any other felony larceny offense and the amount of the goods or chattels taken by the juvenile was less than $750. Under current law, juvenile records of all delinquent acts that would be a felony if committed by an adult are retained.
Title
Juvenile records; expungement for certain felony larceny offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103573D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB709 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB709+hil |