VA HB709 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Zoning violation penalties. Increases the maximum fine for failure to remove or abate a zoning violation after conviction from $1,500 to $2,000 for succeeding 10-day periods after two previous failures to remove or abate the violation in accordance with court-imposed deadlines.
Title
Zoning; violation, penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 42-N) (Y: 51 N: 42 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (16-Y 24-N) (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 37-N 1-A) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 42-N) (Y: 51 N: 42 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (16-Y 24-N) (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 37-N 1-A) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 726 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB709ER) |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2018-03-09 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 42-N) |
2018-03-09 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (51-Y 42-N) |
2018-03-09 | House | Conference substitute printed 18108188D-H1 |
2018-03-09 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: Sturtevant, Favola, Carrico |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: Bell, John J., Stolle, Orrock |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 2-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 94-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (23-Y 17-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Favola agreed to |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (16-Y 24-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (11-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (52-Y 47-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Passed House (52-Y 47-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2018-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 37-N 1-A) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (59-Y 37-N 1-A) |
2018-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 18102445D-E |
2018-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB709E |
2018-02-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-26 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (14-Y 8-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102445D |