VA HB772 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB59-Putney) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB59-Putney) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; qualifications of general registrars. Requires that a general registrar be a qualified voter of the Commonwealth. A general registrar would no longer be required to be a qualified voter of the county or city for which he is appointed.
Title
Elections; qualifications of general registrars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB59-Putney) by voice vote | |
2010-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB59-Putney) by voice vote | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #2 Elections | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102568D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB772 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB772+hil |