VA HB772 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State Inspector General. Includes any full-time sworn investigator of the Office of the State Inspector General in the definition of law-enforcement officer.
Title
Inspector General, State; investigator included in definition of law-enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-07 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2012-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-07 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-30 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103896D |