VA HB775 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Removal of snow and ice; county executive form of government. Authorizes any county outside Planning District 8 that has adopted the county executive form of government (Albemarle County) to provide by ordinance reasonable criteria and requirements for the removal of accumulations of snow and ice from public sidewalks by the owner or other person in charge of any occupied property. Currently, only counties within Northern Virginia Planning District 8 may adopt such an ordinance. This bill is identical to SB 684.
Title
Removal of snow and ice; county executive form of government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 323 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB775ER) |
2018-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (9-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-08 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101862D |