VA HB792 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nutrient credit trading; adjacent hydrologic unit code. Removes authority for a Virginia Stormwater Management Program or Virginia Erosion and Stormwater Management Program to allow compliance with stormwater nonpoint nutrient runoff water quality criteria through the applicant's acquisition of nutrient credits in the same tributary in an adjacent hydrologic unit code (HUC) or fourth order subbasin, unless certain existing criteria for purchasing credits outside of the HUC or fourth order subbasin are met, when the credits are in a locality with a population fewer than 20,000 people and geographic area under 200 square miles.
Title
Nutrient credit trading; adjacent hydrologic unit code.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102525D |