VA HB815 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Gifts to General Assembly members; bright-line rule. Provides that no member of the General Assembly may accept gifts from any business, government, or person, other than a relative, where the total amount of the gifts exceeds $100.
Title
General Assembly members; bright-line rule.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Rules | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #4 Ethics (Special) | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102278D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB815 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB815+hil |