VA HB818 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Number of circuit court judges. Adds an additional circuit court judge to each of the following circuits: 10th (Appomattox, Buckingham, Charlotte, Cumberland, Halifax, Lunenburg, Mecklenburg, Prince Edward); 14th (Henrico); 15th (Fredericksburg, Caroline, Essex, Hanover, King George, Lancaster, Northumberland, Richmond, Spotsylvania, Stafford, Westmoreland); 26th (Harrisonburg, Winchester, Clarke, Frederick, Page, Rockingham, Shenandoah, Warren); 27th (Galax, Radford, Bland, Carroll, Floyd, Giles, Grayson, Montgomery, Pulaski, Wythe); and 30th (Norton, Lee, Scott, Wise). This bill is a recommendation of Judicial Council.
Title
Judges; increases number in circuit court.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-01-25 | House: Assigned App. sub: General Government (Abbitt) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081658866 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB818 |