VA HB818 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Memorials for war veterans; Monument Removal Fund. Provides that a locality may request funding from a special fund to help offset the costs of the lawful removal or relocation of certain monuments. The bill establishes the Monument Removal Fund (the Fund) for such purpose. The bill provides that the Fund shall appear on the individual income tax return and is eligible to receive tax refunds.
Title
Monument Removal Fund; established, memorials for war veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104555D |