VA HB833 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1216)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1216)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prevailing wage; public works contracts; penalty. Requires contractors and subcontractors under any public contract with a state agency, or with a locality that has adopted an ordinance requiring the payment of prevailing wages, for public works to pay wages, salaries, benefits, and other remuneration to any mechanic, laborer, or worker employed, retained, or otherwise hired to perform services in connection with the public contract for public works at the prevailing wage rate. The provisions of the bill would not apply to any contract for public works of $250,000 or less. The Commissioner of Labor and Industry is required to determine the prevailing wage rate for such public contracts on the basis of applicable prevailing wage rate determinations made by the U.S. Secretary of Labor under the provisions of the federal Davis-Bacon Act. A contractor or subcontractor who willfully employs any mechanic, laborer, or worker to perform work contracted to be done under the public contract at a rate that is less than the prevailing wage rate is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. In addition, such a contractor or subcontractor shall be liable to such individuals for the payment of all wages due plus interest and shall be disqualified from bidding on public contracts with any public body until full restitution has been paid to the individuals. The bill has a delayed effective date of May 1, 2021.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; public works contracts, prevailing wage rate, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (49-Y 43-N) (Y: 49 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 46-N 1-A) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 46-N 1-A) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1216) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1216 (effective 5/1/21) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB833ER2) |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (49-Y 43-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (49-Y 43-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB833ER) |
2020-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 46-N 1-A) |
2020-02-27 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (53-Y 46-N 1-A) |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB833H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107486D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Incorporates HB114 (Kory) |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107486D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104666D |
Same As/Similar To
SB8 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1243)