VA HB835 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile and domestic relations district courts; appointment of counsel or guardian ad litem; removal or appeal. Specifies that any attorney appointed to represent a child or parent, guardian, or other adult at a hearing in the juvenile and domestic relations district court shall continue representation upon removal or appeal to the circuit court and upon the juvenile and domestic relations court being divested of the right to enter any further decrees or orders to determine custody, guardianship, visitation, or support. Under current law, such continued representation is discretionary upon appeal to the circuit court. Juvenile and domestic relations district courts; appointment of counsel or guardian ad litem; removal or appeal. Specifies that any attorney appointed to represent a child or parent, guardian, or other adult at a hearing in the juvenile and domestic relations district court shall continue representation upon removal or appeal to the circuit court and upon the juvenile and domestic relations court being divested of the right to enter any further decrees or orders to determine custody, guardianship, visitation, or support. Under current law, such continued representation is discretionary upon appeal to the circuit court.
Title
Juvenile and domestic relations district courts; appointment of counsel or guardian ad litem.
Sponsors
Del. Rae Cousins [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104702D |