VA HB840 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; 250th anniversary of the American Revolution. Authorizes the issuance of revenue-sharing special license plates marking the 250th anniversary of the American Revolution. The bill provides that the prepaid application requirements for special license plates shall not apply to such plates, that the provisions of the bill expire on July 1, 2032, that such plates shall not be newly issued on or after such date, and that such plates may continue in use for a period of time determined by the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
License plates, special; issuance of plates marking 250th anniversary of the American Revolution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106) | |
2024-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 106 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB840ER) |
2024-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Department of Motor Vehicles |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101650D |
Same As/Similar To
SB216 (Similar To) 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0155)