VA HB861 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Summary
Virginia Caregivers Grant Program application; allow physician assistant or nurse practitioner to certify. Allows that a licensed physician assistant or nurse practitioner may provide certification necessary for the Virginia Caregiver's Grant Program application.
Title
Caregivers Grant Program; physician assistant or nurse practitioner to certify.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507) | |
2008-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 507 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-04 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB861ER) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-28 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-18 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-18 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-16 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-15 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084463820 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB861 |