VA HB861 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0419)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0419)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motion picture film production tax credits. Provides refundable income tax credits to any motion picture film production company with qualifying expenses of at least $250,000 with respect to a motion picture film production in the Commonwealth for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2011. The aggregate amount of grants that may be awarded by the Virginia Film Office with respect to film productions in the Commonwealth shall not exceed $2.5 million in the 2010-2012 biennium, and $5 million in any biennium thereafter.
Title
Motion picture film production; provides income tax credits to any company with qualifying expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 93-N) (Y: 2 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (77-Y 18-N) (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 93-N) (Y: 2 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (77-Y 18-N) (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0419) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 419 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-13 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB861ER) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N 1-A) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (79-Y 17-N 1-A) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Conference substitute printed 10105927D-H3 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Senators: Lucas, Whipple, Hanger | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2010-03-03 | House: Delegates: Cline, Cox, M.K., McClellan | |
2010-03-03 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2010-03-03 | House: House acceded to request | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 93-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House 10105763D-S1 (2-Y 93-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB861S1 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105763D-S1 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105763D-S1 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-19 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (77-Y 18-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Passed House (77-Y 18-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB861H2 | |
2010-02-19 | House: Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 10105414D-H2 | |
2010-02-19 | House: Committee substitute from Finance rejected 10104694D-H1 | |
2010-02-19 | House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105414D-H2 | |
2010-02-16 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104694D-H1 | |
2010-02-10 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103579D |
Same As/Similar To
SB257 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599)