VA HB894 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Generation of electricity and energy development in the Commonwealth. Requires the Department of Energy, in cooperation with the Virginia Nuclear Energy Consortium Authority, to convene a stakeholder work group to identify strategies and any needed public policies, including statutory or regulatory changes, for promoting the development of advanced small modular reactors in localities in the Commonwealth. The bill requires the Department of Energy to consider the economic development of rural Virginia while minimizing the impact on prime farmland a key priority in updating its Virginia Energy Plan. Generation of electricity and energy development in the Commonwealth. Requires the Department of Energy, in cooperation with the Virginia Nuclear Energy Consortium Authority, to convene a stakeholder work group to identify strategies and any needed public policies, including statutory or regulatory changes, for promoting the development of advanced small modular reactors in localities in the Commonwealth. The bill requires the Department of Energy to consider the economic development of rural Virginia while minimizing the impact on prime farmland a key priority in updating its Virginia Energy Plan. The bill requires the Virginia Cooperative Extension to develop and maintain a map or repository of prime farmland in the Commonwealth, in consultation with the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, the Department of Forestry, the Department of Conservation and Recreation, and the Department of Energy. An initial report of such map or repository shall be submitted the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2022. Finally, the bill requires the State Corporation Commission to develop a program to encourage and expedite infrastructure investments by Dominion Energy Virginia or American Electric Power, in industrial sites determined to be relevant and in high demand by the Virginia Economic Development Partnership. The bill requires such program to be implemented by December 1, 2022, and the Commission is required to submit a report including recommendations for such program by December 15, 2022, to the Governor and General Assembly.
Title
Advanced small modular reactors; Department of Energy to study development in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 21-N) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 488 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB894ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 21-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22107180D-S1 (76-Y 21-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB894S1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107180D-S1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107180D-S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Energy |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB894H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106227D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106227D-H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103708D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2723 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1724.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1724.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |