VA HB971 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Science and Technology (HB1469-Byron) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Science and Technology (HB1469-Byron) by voice vote
Summary
Database breach notification. Requires a person or business that conducts business in Virginia and that owns or licenses computerized data that includes personal information to conduct a reasonable investigation to promptly determine the likelihood that personal information has been or will be misused when it becomes aware of an incident of unauthorized access to personal customer information. Notification must be made in the most expedient time possible and without unreasonable delay, consistent with the legitimate needs of law enforcement. The bill also contains alternative notification provisions. Any customer injured by a violation of this section may institute a civil action to recover actual damages or to enjoin any business that violates or has violated this section. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Identity theft; notice of database breach.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-04 | House: Incorporated by Science and Technology (HB1469-Byron) by voice vote | |
2008-01-29 | House: Assigned S & T sub: #1 | |
2008-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Science and Technology | |
2008-01-21 | House: Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086219724 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1469 (Similar To) 2011-01-31 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB2043-Anderson) by voice vote
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB971 |