VA HB975 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-13 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 135 (effective 7/1/10)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-13 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 135 (effective 7/1/10)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle titles. Exempts "Special construction and forestry equipment" from having to be titled in Virginia.
Title
Motor vehicle titles; exempts special construction and forestry equipment from being titled.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 135 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0135) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB975ER) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB975H1 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104992D-H1 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104992D-H1 | |
2010-02-02 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Rereferred to Transportation | |
2010-01-28 | House: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to | |
2010-01-28 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-26 | House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103660D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 636 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 636.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 640 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 641 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 642 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |