VA HB975 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Transportation; data on wildlife carcass removal sites. Directs the Department of Transportation to collect and publish annually on its website the sites of wildlife carcass removals from interstate, primary, and secondary roads completed upon the direction of or pursuant to a contract with the Department or the Commonwealth. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2023.
Title
Wildlife carcass removal sites; Dept. of Transportation to collect & publish annually on its website
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Transportation |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100898D |