VA HB988 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB988
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral health services in correctional facilities; report. Requires the Department of Corrections to report to the General Assembly and the Governor on or before October 1 of each year certain population statistics regarding the provision of behavioral health services to persons incarcerated in state correctional facilities. The bill also requires local correctional facilities to report to the State Board of Local and Regional Jails on or before October 1 of each year certain population statistics regarding the provision of behavioral health services to persons incarcerated in local correctional facilities and for the Board to report such statistics to the General Assembly and the Governor on or before December 1 of each year.
Title
Correctional facilities; behavioral health services in facilities, report.
Sponsors
Del. Holly Seibold [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Rozia Henson [D] | Del. Marty Martinez [D] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103105D |
Same As/Similar To
HB988 (Carry Over) 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Correctional Enterprises
Corrections Board of or Department of
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Correctional Enterprises
Corrections Board of or Department of
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB988 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB988+hil |