VA HB995 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Summary
Unlawful filming of another; penalty. Provides that the third offense of unlawful filming of another is a Class 6 felony. Under current law unlawful filming is a felony only if it involves a nonconsenting person under the age of 18.
Title
Unlawful filming of another; guilty of Class 6 felony.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 732 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB995ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 080914432-S1 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB995S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080914432-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080914432-S1 | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety (Sherwood) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080654432 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB995 |