VA HB995 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer of certain firearms; required identification. Allows a prospective purchaser to present a current or retired military identification card or a concealed handgun permit in order to establish citizenship or lawful admission for permanent residence in order to purchase an assault firearm.
Title
Firearms; purchaser may present military identification card or concealed handgun permit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-02-12 | House: Continued to 2011 in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102902D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB995 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB995+hil |