VA HB995 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Payments from timber sales. Limits the payment made to localities by the Department of Forestry to one-fourth of the gross proceeds derived solely from the sale of timber harvested on state forest lands; however, the counties of Appomattox, Buckingham, and Cumberland will receive one-eighth of the gross proceeds from the timber sales on state forest lands located in their county. Currently, localities receive one-fourth of the gross proceeds from revenue generated by any revenue-generating activity occurring on state forest lands.
Title
Forestry, Department of; limits payments from timber sales to localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248) | |
2012-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 248 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB995ER) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-30 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Printed as engrossed 12101658D-E | |
2012-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB995E | |
2012-01-27 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-01-27 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-25 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101658D |
Same As/Similar To
SB428 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197)