VA HJR114 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Virginia Code Commission; feasibility of a comprehensive revision of the Code of Virginia to be gender-neutral; report. Directs the Virginia Code Commission to study the feasibility of a comprehensive revision of the Code of Virginia to eliminate masculine generics and to use gender-neutral language throughout and to make recommendations for the scope of the revision and the best approach for implementing necessary changes. The recommendations shall also include precise guidelines, including a set of gender-neutral rules and style recommendations, to be followed during the revision. The Code Commission is required to report on its findings and recommendations by the first day of the 2021 Regular Session.
Title
Code of Virginia; VCC to study feasibility of a comprehensive revision to be gender neutral.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104753D |