VA HJR127 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ127ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ127ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Trinity United Methodist Church.
Title
Commending Trinity United Methodist Church.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bennett-Parker [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] |
Del. Chad Green [R] | Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ127ER) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-08 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-02-08 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2024-02-02 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 24105376D |