VA HJR164 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ164ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ164ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Gerard Everett Woodbury.
Title
Celebrating the life of Gerard Everett Woodbury.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ164ER) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-19 | House | Agreed to by House |
2024-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-02-11 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 24105020D |