VA HJR181 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ181ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ181ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Honorable James F. Almand.
Title
Commending the Honorable James F. Almand.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Brink [D] | Del. David Englin [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. James Scott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ181ER) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Received | |
2012-01-20 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-01-17 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12103454D | |
2012-01-13 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12103454D |