VA HJR183 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ183ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ183ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending DC's Wine Country®.
Title
Commending DC's Wine Country®.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ183ER) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-26 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-02-15 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 24105400D |