VA HJR24 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR24
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; joint subcommittee; Dillon Rule; report. Creates a 13-member joint subcommittee for a one-year study of the Dillon Rule and its impact on Virginia's localities.
Title
Dillon Rule; joint subcommittee to study.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104795D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR24 (Carry Over) 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
SJR18 (Similar To) 2024-02-02 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
SJR18 (Similar To) 2024-02-02 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HJ24 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HJ24+hil |