VA HJR272 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Stricken at request of Patron in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Stricken at request of Patron in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Walmart Supercenter Store 2805.
Title
Commending Walmart Supercenter Store 2805.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Stricken at request of Patron in Rules by voice vote |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-02-20 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-20 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2020-02-19 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20108098D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HJ272 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HJ272+hil |