VA HJR304 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ304ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ304ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Mary Frances DeLorenzo Knight.
Title
Celebrating the life of Mary Frances DeLorenzo Knight.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ304ER) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Received |
2014-02-14 | House | Agreed to by House |
2014-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 14102405D |
2014-02-12 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14102405D |