VA HJR320 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ320ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ320ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Lynchburg-based 1st Battalion, 116th Infantry Brigade Combat Team.
Title
Commending the Lynchburg-based 1st Battalion, 116th Infantry Brigade Combat Team.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ320ER) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Received |
2014-02-21 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2014-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 14104325D |
2014-02-14 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14104325D |