VA HJR392 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ392ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ392ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Mt. Zion Baptist Church.
Title
Commending Mt. Zion Baptist Church.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Jackson Miller [R] |
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ392ER) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Received | |
2010-03-10 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-03-10 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-03-05 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10105753D | |
2010-03-04 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10105753D |