VA HJR394 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-32-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ394ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-32-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ394ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Andrea Lynch Lohr.
Title
Celebrating the life of Andrea Lynch Lohr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ394ER) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Received | |
2012-02-24 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2012-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-17 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12104619D | |
2012-02-16 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12104619D |