VA HJR62 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ62ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ62ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Charles Wayne Payne, Sr.
Title
Celebrating the life of Charles Wayne Payne, Sr.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Milde [R] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Chad Green [R] | Del. Robert Orrock [R] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Phillip Scott [R] | Del. Scott Wyatt [R] | Del. Eric Zehr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ62ER) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Received |
2024-01-15 | House | Agreed to by House |
2024-01-15 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/10/24 24102193D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR5 (Similar To) 2024-01-15 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ5ER)