VA HJR66 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC to study the cost of implementation of the Refugee Resettlement Program to the Commonwealth and localities; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to identify and evaluate the various fiscal impacts of the Refugee Resettlement Program on the Commonwealth and localities, including costs related to health care, employment, and social and support services for refugees in the Commonwealth and including historical trends and expected future fiscal impacts. As part of its study, the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission shall specifically address the costs, current and future, of resettlement of Syrian refugees in the Commonwealth.
Title
Refugee Resettlement Program; JLARC to study cost to the Commonwealth and localities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Rules |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2016-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101734D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HJ66 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HJ66+hil |