VA HJR66 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Transportation; commuter rail system in the Commonwealth; report. Requests the Department of Transportation to study and develop best practices for constructing, operating, and maintaining a commuter rail system in the Commonwealth.
Title
Commuter rail system in the Commonwealth; Department of Transportation to study.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104020D |